LEE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1075991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hilary Bremner Chair
ACTS OF KINDNESS COMMUNITY (SOLENT) Overdue by 112 days
John Betterton Trustee 20 July 2016 None on record
Joyce Love Trustee 29 September 2021 None on record
Janet Ailsa Aps Trustee 19 June 2019 None on record
Gina Rowe Trustee 25 June 2014 None on record
Helen Gibbons Trustee 01 September 2006 None on record
Martine Cox Trustee 01 September 2006 None on record
JANE LAMBERT Trustee 12 September 2018 None on record
Diane Ring Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
SUSAN SELBIE Trustee None on record