STAFFORDSHIRE& BIRMINGHAM AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1073166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £1.74m £1.78m £1.74m £1.80m £1.22m
Total expenditure £1.62m £1.63m £1.63m £1.70m £1.27m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £52.03k £49.35k £102.71k £26.94k £550
Income - Other trading activities £1.30m £1.35m £1.25m £1.33m £1.08m
Income - Charitable activities £377.66k £371.82k £380.88k £375.20k £91.09k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.93k -£412 £0 £1.84k £885
Income - Other £12.01k £12.83k £6.16k £69.48k £45.02k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £372.45k £372.87k £396.59k £407.14k £143.63k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.22m £1.22m £1.15m £1.25m £1.08m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £59.49k £47.20k £15.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £26.65k £30.21k £80.90k £47.20k £40.59k