Financial history WORD OF FAITH CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES - LONDON

Charity number: 1074887
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £89.08k £139.64k £84.08k £34.73k £32.19k
Total expenditure £81.74k £134.86k £85.01k £25.27k £27.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A