Edible culture operative

Charity number: 1076110
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2021 18 November 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2019 25 July 2020 267 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2018 08 November 2018 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2017 14 November 2017 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 Not Required