Accounts and annual returns MILLHOUSE GREEN MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 1074224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 04 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 25 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required