Financial history MILLHOUSE GREEN MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 1074224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £19.38k £12.15k £11.48k £11.15k £17
Total expenditure £18.61k £12.67k £11.03k £9.95k £264
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.34k N/A N/A N/A