Financial history MERTON COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity number: 1073312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £708.34k £602.37k £672.49k £530.99k £633.31k
Total expenditure £748.11k £609.92k £629.44k £560.35k £611.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £25.00k £350.00k £73.47k £16.86k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £2.10k £1.04k
Income - Other trading activities £25.00k £0 £0 £0 £36
Income - Charitable activities £679.07k £679.07k £637.26k £526.59k £632.23k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £215 £215 £231 £104 £0
Income - Other £4.05k £4.05k £35.00k £2.20k £17
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £748.11k £584.92k £629.44k £560.35k £611.57k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £25.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.48k £14.29k £0 £15.85k £15.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0