Trustees MERTON COMMUNITY TRANSPORT
Charity number: 1073312

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell Makin | Chair | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hooper | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Otuagoma Otite | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Fraser | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Akidi Ocan | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEPHEN HARALD FREDERICK HICKEY | Trustee | 08 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Olumide Osayameh | Trustee | 28 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
FRANCESCA MAY HIBBERT | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ABAYEH SAVAGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.