WESTWARD PATHFINDER

Charity number: 1075429
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Delivery of training and job search to disadvantaged individuals throughout Devon delivered through a network of learning centres. Training includes literacy and numeracy, IT and a range of vocational qualifications including NVQs and short courses such as food hygiene. The Trust specialises in using on-line learning to deliver training and job search through it's network of rural learning centres

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 May 1999: Standard registration
  • 05 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • PATHFINDER (Working name)
  • THE NORTH DEVON PATHFINDER TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £1.84m £1.70m £1.71m £1.70m £993.18k
Total expenditure £1.81m £1.68m £1.71m £1.68m £1.23m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £1.70m £496.13k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £6.25k
Income - Donations and legacies £8.24k £15.41k £1.75k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.80m £1.67m £1.70m £1.70m £991.88k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £125 £164 £235 £55 £29
Income - Other £29.30k £17.49k £8.36k £4.75k £1.27k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.80m £1.67m £1.69m £1.67m £1.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.16k £9.62k £19.75k £16.24k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Own use assets £91.35k £87.91k £55.58k £28.38k £22.74k
Long-term investments £0 £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k
Other assets £432.80k £395.89k £393.00k £369.45k £165.50k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £273.30k £219.84k £181.18k £113.56k £143.65k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 November 2016 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 12 September 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 02 November 2015 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 28 September 2015 On Time