ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scottish Country Dance classes for all ages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 16 June 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRIE JOHN SIMCOCK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nigel Charles Sharp | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Austin | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Vidiella Badell | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Rae Witheridge | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lewis | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNE HEMPHILL LYNCH | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY ROWE | Trustee | 18 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.64k | £1.16k | £1.34k | £3.33k | £4.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.06k | £1.37k | £1.30k | £3.15k | £3.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MAY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF LEAMINGTON SPA AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD, HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE DISTRICT" IN TRADITIONAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCING, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) PRESERVING AND FURTHERING THE PRACTICE OF TRADITIONAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCES. (B) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING INSTRUCTION IN THE DANCING OF SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCES (C) PROMOTING THE ENJOYMENT AND APPRECIATION OF SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCING AND MUSIC BY ANY SUITABLE MEANS.
Area of benefit
LEAMINGTON SPA AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 REGENT STREET
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV32 5HW
- Phone:
- 07734 036 004
- Email:
- MBAKER@PSSLTD.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window