GENESIS ASSOCIATION (WALES)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide advocacy/advice/information services and promotes education, training and re training of people who, through their social and economic circumstances, are in need and unable to gain employment, and in particular to promote and support schemes where they may receive training for employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Wrexham
Governance
- 18 May 1999: Standard registration
- 15 May 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £200 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £650 | £450 | £275 | £200 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 OCTOBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY A SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 23 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING OF PEOPLE WHO, THROUGH THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, ARE IN NEED AND UNABLE TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT, AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT SCHEMES WHERE THEY MAY RECEIVE TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGH FIT (3) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN FINDING EMPLOYMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window