PAKISTAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION SLOUGH

Charity number: 1074854
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 July 2018 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 July 2018 152 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 February 2017 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 February 2017 9 days late Download