PAKISTAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION SLOUGH

Charity number: 1074854
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £33.89k £37.69k £50.20k £217.40k £66.74k
Total expenditure £42.88k £38.46k £42.56k £63.92k £38.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.61k £3.00k N/A N/A