THE FRIENDS OF BITHAM BROOK SCHOOL

Charity number: 1073776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity advances the education of pupils in the school in particular by: 1. developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school; 2. engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which supports the school and advance the education of the pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £9,500
Total expenditure: £5,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FOBBS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Joanne Lawson Chair 07 October 2022
None on record
Katie Jane Norris Trustee 07 October 2022
None on record
Laura Brenda Richards Trustee 07 October 2022
None on record
Alexandra Julie Harris Trustee 07 October 2022
None on record
Helen Louise Bailey Trustee 07 October 2022
None on record
Alexis Harris Trustee 07 October 2022
None on record
Kelly Jane Davy Trustee 31 October 2019
None on record
Andrea Louise Harris Trustee 06 October 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.66k £3.29k £296 £4.85k £9.50k
Total expenditure £5.59k £2.44k £524 £13.56k £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 August 2022 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 March 2021 273 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bitham Brook Cp School
Arundell Close
Westbury
BA13 3UA
Phone:
07971425997