PROJECT RYDER

Charity number: 1074520
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £9.18k £3.77k £5.01k £5.30k £3.28k
Total expenditure £9.01k £7.68k £2.23k £852 £870
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A