BOSOM PALS ( M.K. )

Charity number: 1075245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Breast Cancer Support Group meeting twice monthly. The group provides advise, help and simple treats for members, relatives, carers and newly diagnosed patients in hospital. We fundraise to make other group activities possible and liaise with the local hospital Trust to improve services for patients".

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 28 February 2021

Total income: £2,786
Total expenditure: £2,697

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Milton Keynes

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 April 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Ollier Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Carole Allan Trustee 23 July 2014
None on record
MRS ROS TAYLOR Trustee
None on record
DOREEN KATHLEEN LA BASTIDE Trustee
None on record
MRS JAFF NEWTON Trustee
None on record
LINDA MARGARET WILSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £5.25k £9.36k £6.59k £4.66k £2.79k
Total expenditure £6.73k £8.56k £8.57k £4.67k £2.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 04 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 06 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 10 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
86 WOLVERTON ROAD
NEWPORT PAGNELL
MK16 8JG
Phone:
01908610598