TAVISTOCK RIDING FOR THE DISABLED

Charity number: 1073407
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VICTORIA MARGARET LILLA TAYLOR Trustee 24 September 2018 None on record
MR Ross Wood Trustee 06 November 2015 None on record
Frances Patricia Ann Girling Trustee 11 January 2019 None on record
PATRICIA ROSAMOND MACKINTOSH Trustee 14 September 2012 None on record
MRS PRU MILLS Chair 14 September 2012 None on record
ELISABETH DILL Trustee 13 September 2013 None on record
JANET TILSTON Trustee 19 September 2014 None on record
IAN ROBINSON Trustee 19 September 2014 None on record
CORINA WINEFRIDE CLEMENT Trustee 19 October 2018 None on record