ARMLEY HELPING HANDS

Charity number: 1076692
Charity reporting is up to date (107 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 May 2021 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 May 2021 107 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 October 2019 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 October 2019 264 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On time Download