ARMLEY HELPING HANDS

Charity number: 1076692
Charity reporting is up to date (107 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £265.67k £200.24k £167.92k £224.59k £257.80k
Total expenditure £237.89k £192.06k £187.65k £216.79k £254.32k
Income from government contracts £90.58k £0 £90 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £28.72k £97.08k £90.58k £130.04k £104.02k