THE ACOUSTIC NEUROMA AND MENINGIOMA NETWORK ( AMNET )

Charity number: 1073908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 03 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 02 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 06 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required