THE CHILDRENS AND FAMILY CENTRE, SHIRLEY
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
******IN LIQUIDATION******* THE ETHOS OF THE CENTRE IS TO REDUCE THE SOCIAL ISOLATION OF PARENTS BY PROVIDING A FOCAL POINT WHERE THEY CAN 'DROP IN', SOCIALISE, RECEIVE ADVICE AND SUPPORT FROM HEALTH VISITORS AND OTHER PROFESSIONALS AND BENEFIT FROM BASIC SKILLS COURSES, SUCH AS LITERACY, NUMERACY, PARENTING CLASSES. WE ALSO PROVIDE A NURSERY FOR CHILDREN AGED 2-5YEARS.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2016
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £157,388 o gontract(au) llywodraeth
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Croydon
Llywodraethu
- 02 Chwefror 2001: Cofrestrwyd
- 27 Mehefin 2019: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- LEAF HOUSE (Enw gwaith)
- THE FAMILY CENTRE SHRUBLANDS LIMITED (Enw blaenorol)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £344.67k | £240.16k | £143.51k | £143.51k | £157.39k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £348.97k | £316.83k | £211.08k | £211.08k | £161.42k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £157.39k | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 27 Chwefror 2017 | 27 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 27 Chwefror 2017 | 27 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 6 AUGUST 1997 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 AUGUST 2009, AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 AUGUST 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF FAMILIES WITH YOUNG CHILDREN AND EXPECTANT PARENTS WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE FAMILIES WITH YOUNG CHILDREN AND EXPECTANT PARENTS RESIDENT IN SHIRLEY AND IMMEDIATE SURROUNDINGS THROUGH PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROVISION AND ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF IT AND BY REASON OF THEIR CIRCUMSTANCES OR THEIR PHYSICAL OR EMOTIONAL STATE AND BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS REGARDLESS OF AGE, SEX, RACE, POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Maes buddion
SHRUBLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window