SALERS CATTLE SOCIETY OF THE UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of agriculture by the management, promotion and the improvement of the breeding of the Salers breed of livestock and the maintenance of the purity of the breed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 July 2006: Standard registration
- SALER CATTLE SOCIETY OF THE UK LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERENCE PYE | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tom Walling | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN MARY LIVESEY | Trustee | 09 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Robert Neil Livesey | Trustee | 05 July 2006 |
|
|
||||
ALAN HOWATSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.73k | £104.17k | £121.02k | £98.65k | £87.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.00k | £87.27k | £104.97k | £115.79k | £103.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 MARCH 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19 JUNE 1985 AND 21 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF AGRICULTURE BY THE MANAGEMENT, PROMOTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BREEDING OF THE SALERS' BREED OF LIVESTOCK AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE PURITY OF THE BREED AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) TO COMPILE, KEEP, MAINTAIN, EDIT, ISSUE AND PUBLISH A HERD BOOK OF RECOGNISED AND PURE-BRED SALERS CATTLE AND A REGISTER OR REGISTERS SUPPLEMENTARY THERETO OF OTHER RECOGNISED AND QUALIFIED CATTLE FOR BREEDING PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lane Farm
Milnthorpe
LA7 7NH
- Phone:
- 07903626249
- Email:
- secretary@salers.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window