Governing document LANCASHIRE- GULU LOCAL AGENDA 21 LINK LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 SEPTEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 JUNE 1996, 9 MAY 1997 AND 1 DECEMBER 2001. CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 JUNE 1996 AND 6 JUNE 1997.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LANCASHIRE AND GULU, UGANDA THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A PROGRAMME OF ACTIVITIES WHICH LINK THE TWO COMMUNITIES WHICH WILL ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS OR DISTRESS, ADVANCE RELIGION OR TO UNDERTAKE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
LANCASHIRE AND GULU, UGANDA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.