HANDICAP INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 1082565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.19m £6.87m £7.08m £13.79m £17.13m
Total expenditure £6.19m £6.87m £7.08m £13.79m £17.13m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £25.34k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.21m £2.92m £2.95m £5.33m N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.43m £1.19m £1.51m £2.04m £1.88m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.76m £5.67m £5.57m £11.74m £15.25m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £363 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £166.67k £3.33k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.33m £6.12m £6.06m £12.96m £16.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £864.06k £742.76k £1.02m £822.28k £872.69k
Expenditure - Governance £51.50k £64.65k £59.34k £65.09k £72.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0