Trustees MAISEMORE GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PATRICIA ALICE MILSOM Chair 02 March 2019
None on record
DEBORAH ANNE BURGESS Trustee 06 January 2022
None on record
PATRICIA KUCHARSKI Trustee 28 July 2020
MAISEMORE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING
Recently registered
Lynette Celia Taylor Trustee 02 April 2019
None on record
Annitta Engel Trustee 16 April 2018
MAISEMORE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING
Recently registered
Carole Susan Banks Trustee 16 April 2018
None on record
MRS RUTH MARTIN Trustee
None on record