RISINGBRIDGE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Improving the lives of people with disabilities through the provision of horse riding. Enabling them to improve their health and wellbeing, delivering therapy to benefit mobility, co-ordination, confidence and self worth whilst having fun.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,348
Total expenditure: £3,979

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION RISINGBRIDGE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Wheeler Trustee 11 July 2023
None on record
Gordon Clark Trustee 21 June 2022
None on record
Melanie Clark Trustee 15 September 2020
None on record
Jennifer Margaret Hayes Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Best Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Jane Austin Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
HELEN KERSHAW Trustee
None on record
MAGGIE MOORE Trustee
None on record
RACHAEL MEAD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.74k £3.54k £6.09k £237 £3.35k
Total expenditure £2.59k £662 £2.69k £3.96k £3.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hunigham Cottage
Stoke Road
Wychbold
Droitwich
WR9 0BT
Phone:
01527 861547
Website:

rachaelmead@gmail.com