INSTITUTE OF ECOTECHNICS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Institute of Ecotechnics was founded in 1973 to develop and practice the discipline of ecotechnics: the ecology of technics, and the technics of ecology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 June 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MARK NELSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Omar Fayed | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claus Tober | Trustee | 08 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Manno Franca | Trustee | 08 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Christine Handte | Trustee | 21 September 2006 |
|
|
||||
Kathelin Gray | Trustee | 26 June 2000 |
|
|
||||
John Allen | Trustee | 26 June 2000 |
|
|
||||
GERARD HOUGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Judy Hawes | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £268.45k | £153.00k | £309.01k | £70.09k | £55.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £269.45k | £154.03k | £308.47k | £67.69k | £57.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 November 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 November 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH AUGUST 1985, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10TH MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE DISCIPLINE OF ECOTECHNICS WHICH DEALS WITH THE RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN HUMANITY AND THE BIOSPHERE, PARTICULARLY BY PROMOTING PROJECTS AND RESEARCH WHICH EXTEND THE STUDY OF ECOLOGY TO INCLUDE HUMAN, MECHANICAL. CHEMICAL AND CULTURAL ASPECTS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
INSTITUTE OF ECOTECHNICS
LUNDONIA HOUSE
24 OLD GLOUCESTER STREET
LONDON
WC1N 3AL
- Phone:
- 02074051824
- Email:
- chili@octobergallery.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window