Accounts and annual returns LEEDS AREA RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required