Financial history LEEDS AREA RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.15k £12.39k £26.63k £25.24k £25.86k
Total expenditure £20.13k £18.97k £17.73k £20.61k £21.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k