HAMPSLEY HOLLOW RIDING FOR THE DISABLED GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Riding for the disabled
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- LACKHAM & CHIPPENHAM GROUP RDA (Working name)
- LACKHAM GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION LACKHAM GROUP (Previous name)
- THE LACKHAM AND CHIPPENHAM RIDING FOR THE DISABLED GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.72k | £11.58k | £4.44k | £23.38k | £9.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.64k | £10.72k | £12.98k | £10.04k | £11.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 26 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 15 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED 23 JUNE 2009.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE NORTH & MID WILTSHIRE AREA
Area of benefit
NORTH & MID WILTSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window