CHERUBIM AND SERAPHIM CHURCH SURU-IERE AYO NIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spreading the word of God and proclaiming the teachings of Jesus Christ. Counselling people in respect of personal problems, looking after people with spiritual needs. spiritual healing to members and public at large.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
- United States
Governance
- 31 May 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR JOSEPH AJALA | Chair | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abiodun Fadairo | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Segun Ajilore | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
APOSTLE ADEKUNLE AYODELE-ALARA | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
YEWANDE BABAYEMI | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR FRANCIS ADEWOLE ABATTI | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.60k | £47.33k | £58.20k | £59.46k | £57.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.01k | £35.36k | £44.20k | £44.31k | £64.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 December 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 December 2021 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9TH OCTOBER 1998, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14TH APRIL 2000 as amended on 13 Jan 2018 as amended on 04 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY MEANS OF SPREADING THE MESSAGE EOF THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST IN ENGLAND AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD FOR THE SALVATION OF SOULS.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
95 SEYMOUR ROAD
LONDON
N8 0BH
- Phone:
- 02088086858
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window