JAMA-AT-UL ISLAMIYYA OF NIGERIA (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the charity include: weekend and end of months prayer meetings, weekend classes for adults and children, monthly youth activities, yearly Eid prayers and celebrations, annual family outings/trips and regular advice and advocacy as necessary. Visiting sick people at home and in hospital. conducting naming and wedding ceremonies, and funeral service and prayers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 February 2001: Standard registration
- JAMA-AT-ISLAMIYYA OF NIGERIA (UK) LTD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KABIR ONAJOBI | Chair | 14 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mujidat Laniyan | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Olatunde Amolegbe | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sherifat Gbadamosi | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Olayinka Agusto | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Waheed Mohammed | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Saheed Jimoh | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abosede King | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdulrahman Abdulraheem | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Modinat Ajibola | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
KUSAMOT OWOLARAFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALHAJI TAJUDEEN ADEBAYO IGINLA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALHAJA OSENI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEHINDE ODUSOTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAHROOFDEEN OYEKAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.40k | £88.59k | £88.59k | £155.35k | £142.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.03k | £83.19k | £83.19k | £74.70k | £94.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 July 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 08 July 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 208 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 October 2020 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 October 2020 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH DECEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED ON 29 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
(1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION ; (11) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 BUNGALOW ROAD
LONDON
SE25 6JZ
- Phone:
- 02087718021
- Website:
-
www,camberwellislamiccentre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.