HIGHFIELDS COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1079256
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 March 2020 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 March 2019 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 May 2018 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 March 2017 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required