HIGHFIELDS COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1079256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.68k £4.47k £5.24k £2.59k £2.93k
Total expenditure £3.86k £1.79k £3.02k £1.61k £1.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A