Pebsham Primary Academy Parent Teacher Association

Charity number: 1075042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £6.78k £4.21k £8.98k £10.16k £3.19k
Total expenditure £4.87k £2.93k £5.64k £12.69k £1.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A