THE GROE, CWMDAUDDWR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AS PER CONSTITUTION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
Total income includes £2,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Powys
Governance
- 31 March 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Griffiths | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Rees | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Wozencraft | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Woosnam | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
David lloyd | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROY DAVIES | Trustee | 27 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANE EVANS | Trustee | 27 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT LEWIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHEN ADAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £1.73k | £13.19k | £21.55k | £15.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.11k | £2.75k | £13.62k | £10.66k | £2.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £11.53k | £3.00k | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 15 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE A PUBLIC RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF LLANSANTFFRAED CWMDAUDDWR WARD OF THE RHAYADER COMMUNITY IN THE COUNTY OF POWYS.
Area of benefit
LLANSANTFFRAED CWMDAUDDWR WARD OF THE RHAYADER COMMUNITY, RHAYADER POWYS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clas Barn
RHAYADER
Powys
LD6 5HH
- Phone:
- 07971510008
- Email:
- roy@elanvalleylodge.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window