Trustees ETAL GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pauline Jane Hall Chair 14 May 2018
HOLY TRINITY WITH ST MARY, BERWICK PARISH CHURCH
Received: On time
Catherine Ready Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Jennifer Phipps Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Helen Newlands Trustee 26 September 2016
None on record
Elizabeth Walker Trustee 20 December 2012
None on record
JOYCE STEVENS Trustee 26 May 2011
None on record
MRS SUE WADE Trustee 26 May 2011
None on record
Sheila Elizabeth Mary Roddam Trustee 27 January 2004
None on record
MRS DIANA SLEE Trustee
None on record