YNYS MON (ANGLESEY) GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1074387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide the opportunity of riding or pony& trap driving to disabled children and adults who might benefit in their general health and well being and have fun at the same time. The riding is held at Anglesey Riding Centre and the pony & trap driving at Llaneilian, Anglesey.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Isle Of Anglesey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 February 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • YNYS MON ANGLESEY GROUP RDA (Working name)
  • RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION YNYS MON (ANGLESEY) GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROLE ANNE GORNALL Trustee 14 February 2011
None on record
VALERY ANNE THOMAS Trustee
None on record
JANICE MARGARET WITHENSHAW Trustee
None on record
TERESA MARGARET PLANK Trustee
None on record
SARA ELLEN JONES-WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.70k £1.26k £4.14k £480 £0
Total expenditure £11.01k £2.36k £2.94k £1.58k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 September 2024 219 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 September 2024 584 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 March 2022 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE CLOISTERS
LLANALLGO
MOELFRE
LL72 8NE
Phone:
01248410267
Website:

No information available