Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST. JAMES LITTLE CLACTON

Charity number: 1074454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 17 March 2022 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 February 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required