Financial history FRIENDS OF ST. JAMES LITTLE CLACTON

Charity number: 1074454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £890 £690 £685 £160 £781
Total expenditure £585 £496 £188 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A