SWANSWELL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1074891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 06 January 2017 On time Download