RADLETT AND ALDENHAM SENIOR CITIZENS' WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1077196
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST JANUARY 1999 AND AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 1ST JULY 1999 AND 6TH DECEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN THE VILLAGE OF RADLETT WITHIN THE PARISH OF ALDENHAM, HERTFORDSHIRE
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 26 August 1999 : registered
  • 17 March 2009 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • RADLETT OLD PEOPLES WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Organisations