Accounts and annual returns ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY (BATH BRANCH)

Charity number: 1074609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required