Trustees THE NORTHAMPTON THEATRES TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1075741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Antrobus Chair 30 November 2021
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE ARTS MANAGEMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Jamal Alwahabi Trustee 27 September 2021
NORTHAMPTON TOWN OF SANCTUARY
Received: On time
Adam William Brown Trustee 27 September 2021
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE SPORT
Received: On time
Sharon Jennifer De Leonardis Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Samuel Jonathan Munday-Webb Trustee 24 November 2020
THE UK PANTOMIME ASSOCIATION
Recently registered
TANYA GRACE MOODIE Trustee 24 November 2020
THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF DRAMATIC ART
Received: On time
Jane Margaret Bunce Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record
Bernadette Angela Lally Trustee 08 May 2017
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE ARTS MANAGEMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Kay Elizabeth Roberts Trustee 08 May 2017
None on record
Frances Eleanor Holloway Trustee 08 May 2017
None on record
Hannah Fay Miller Trustee 22 June 2015
TAMASHA THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time