CHILDRENS HOMES IN KERALA STATE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide relief to destitute children in Southern India in particular, but not exclusively, by the provision of temporary shelter and care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- India
Governance
- 08 July 1999: Standard registration
- 05 March 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CHIKS (Working name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.45k | £227.63k | £168.79k | £160.71k | £61.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.82k | £158.70k | £157.24k | £133.41k | £177.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 February 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 February 2024 | 110 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF 19 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF VARIATION DATED 6 AUGUST 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO DESTITUTE CHILDREN IN SOUTHERN INDIA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY SHELTER AND CARE
Area of benefit
SOUTHERN INDIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window