Dogfen lywodraethu NATIONAL CONFIDENTIAL ENQUIRY INTO PATIENT OUTCOME AND DEATH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/02/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/01/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2003 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 MAY 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 APR 2017 as amended on 11 Dec 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ASSIST IN MAINTAINING AND IMPROVING STANDARDS OF HEALTHCARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY REVIEWING THE MANAGEMENT OF PATIENTS, BY UNDERTAKING AND PROVIDING THE UNDERTAKING OF CONFIDENTIAL SURVEYS AND RESEARCH, AND BY MAINTAINING AND IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF PATIENT CARE, AND BY PUBLISHING AND GENERALLY MAKING AVAILABLE THE RESULTS OF SUCH ACTIVITIES
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.