PUKAR DISABILITY RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Drop in information & advice. Advocacy & support, training & accredited courses, carers outreach project, leisure & social activities, all provided with bi-lingual support for disabled people, carersr families and unemployed people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 23 September 1999: Standard registration
- Pukar Centre (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH HOLDEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Heather Deans | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Saajid Tagari | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
kHALID AKRAM | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ayas Isap | Trustee | 15 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarwar Ali | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Shakir | Trustee | 11 September 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.44k | £127.92k | £107.81k | £105.28k | £118.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.38k | £100.96k | £106.96k | £89.83k | £99.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/08/1999 AS AMENDED ON 17/12/2015 AS AMENDED ON 02 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES OR THEIR CARERS, PARTICULARLY THOSE OF THE ETHNIC MINORITY COMMUNITY PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WHO ARE FROM PRESTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. TO PROMOTE ACCESSIBLE CENTRE IN PRESTON TOWN CENTRE, WHERE DISABLED ADULTS, CHILDREN AND THEIR CARERS CAN ACCESS INFORMATION, RESOURCES AND TRAINING, USING TRAINED STAFF AND VOLUNTEERS.
Area of benefit
PRESTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
3-5 OAKHAM COURT
PRESTON
PR1 3XP
- Phone:
- 01772822700
- Email:
- enquiries@pukar.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window