Shantona Women's & Family Centre Ltd.

Charity number: 1075752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tayba Azim Trustee 12 July 2021 None on record
CATHERINE JOAN MAHONEY Trustee 27 February 2017
LEEDS OLDER PEOPLE'S FORUM Recently registered
Susan Boalch Trustee 04 November 2019 None on record
Lauren Richarson Trustee 22 March 2021 None on record
Melody Walker Trustee 17 June 2019 None on record
Jill Jones Trustee 30 October 2013 None on record
Lynne Anne GUZHA Trustee 23 April 2018 None on record
Ann Eveleigh Chair 10 December 2018 None on record
Aysha Malik Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
Alexandra Martin Trustee 20 July 2020 None on record