THE ST STEPHEN'S RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO RESTORE, PROTECT AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE GRADE 1 LISTED FORMER VICTORIAN CHURCH OF ST STEPHEN'S, HAMPSTEAD, AND TO MAKE PROVISION FOR ITS USE FOR EDUCATION AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF HAMPSTEAD. BUILDING WORK WAS COMPLETED IN 2009. THE PERMANENT TENANT HAS MOVED IN AND THE BUILDING IS NOW OPEN FOR PUBLIC USE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 April 1999: Standard registration
- ST STEPHEN'S TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebby Jake Wallis | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lora Binh | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Magloire | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bijan Seghatchian | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE WHEELER | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CELIA ANNE SCHAPIRA BA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216.49k | £101.65k | £127.92k | £110.13k | £112.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.94k | £94.32k | £126.34k | £152.89k | £135.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST SEALED ON 26TH MARCH 1999, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 7TH FEBRUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
TO RESTORE PROTECT AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROPERTY FORMERLY KNOWN AS ST STEPHEN'S CHURCH POND STREET HAMPSTEAD LONDON NW3 2PP (ST STEPHEN'S) AND IN PARTICULAR (IF THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO MAKE PROVISION FOR THE USE OF ST STEPHEN'S FOR THE PURPOSES OF EDUCATION OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF HAMPSTEAD.
Area of benefit
HAMPSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST STEPHEN'S RESTORATION
AND PRESERVATION TRUST
POND STREET
HAMPSTEAD
LONDON
NW3 5PP
- Phone:
- 02074331272
- Website:
-
WWW.STSTEPHENSTRUST.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window