ADVENT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (NEWHAM)

Charity number: 1081101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.00k £17.00k £19.30k £20.47k £9.69k
Total expenditure £19.36k £23.74k £17.08k £19.43k £15.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A